THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:30:28 PM
Adamson, Peter Allan
CPSO#:
25872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ethiopia
Iraq
Nepal
Russian Federation
Rwanda
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER ALLAN ADAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Nov 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1981 |