skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 23:04:33 PM

Holmes, Roger Gordon

CPSO#: 25805

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roger Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 May 2018


Instructions/Address:

DocuDavit Solutions,
28 Eugene Street,
Toronto, ON,  M6B 3Z4,
Tel: 416-781-9083, 1-888-781-9083,
Fax: 1-866-297-9338,
Website: www.docudavit.com.
Downtown Toronto Office:
1200 - 121 Richmond Street West,
Toronto, ON,  M6B 3Z4.
Date Received: 04 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018