THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:20:22 PM
Silverberg, Jay David Howard
CPSO#:
25747
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jay Silverberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 3 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2024 |