skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 14:21:14 PM

Brosky, Shirley Irene

CPSO#: 25733

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com 
Date Received: 15 Dec 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014