THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:08:58 AM
Shamess, Charles Joseph
CPSO#:
25668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor, Holland Cross Tower B
1600 Scott St.
Ottawa, ON K1A 0K9
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Phone: 613-948-7995
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dynacare at: 613-738-1242.
Date Received: 16 Sep 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:28 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES JOSEPH SHAMESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMESS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1973 |