skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 15:55:56 PM

Mullin, James Gordon

CPSO#: 25664

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Stewart Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 6K5
Phone: (613) 789-8282 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES GORDON MULLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 7, 2018, Dr. Mullin has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On August 16, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required psychiatry physician, Dr. James Gordon Mullin, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Mullin to:

Attend and provide proof of attendance at the Psychopharmacology 2016 conference or equivalent acceptable to the College;

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the next available course acceptable to the College on medical record-keeping;

Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.