skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/21 1:50:56 AM

Ko, Evan Kwing-Yuen

CPSO#: 25654

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Elva court
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 7Y2
Phone: 9058849783 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ko ( CPSO# 25654 )

Business Address:
9915 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V1

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]`
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EVAN KWING-YUEN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973