THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 20:07:50 PM
O'Connor, Mary Elizabeth
CPSO#:
25579
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Feb 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Nov 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 4, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mary Elizabeth O'Connor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2023.
While allegations of professional misconduct were pending before the Discipline Tribunal but not yet determined and her practice was under investigation, Dr. O'Connor voluntarily agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)