THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:42:38 PM
Olsson, Larry Sven Morten Daniel
CPSO#:
25521
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Apr 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Larry Olsson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients must provide written consent along with payment for copies of medical records.
R R 7
2517 Nixon Road
Simcoe, ON N3Y 4K6
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:04 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |