skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/07/22 13:40:13 PM

Astaphan, George Mario

CPSO#: 25508

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Jun 1991
Summary:

In June 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Astaphan guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); in that he charged a fee for services not performed, contrary to s. 27(15); in that he falsified a record in respect of the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 27(16); in that he knowingly submitted a false or misleading account or false or misleading charges for services rendered to a patient, contrary to s. 27(17); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Astaphan's licence to practice be suspended for a period of eighteen months, and that he be fined the sum of $5000.00. The Committee further stipulated that Dr. Astaphan consent to and cooperate in an inspection of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, within six months and again within eighteen months of his recommencing his practice in Ontario. Dr. Astaphan was also obliged to undertake to comply with directives of the College concerning the prescription and use of anabolic steroids, as set out in the College Notice of November 1988.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-05-22
Hearing Date(s): 03 Jun 1991