skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 1:15:28 AM

Vlaovic, Branislav

CPSO#: 25494

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Mar 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education: University of Belgrade, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Branislav Vlaovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Appletree Medical 
1450 O'Connor Dr
Unit 20
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Date Received: 26 Apr 2018


Instructions/Address:

Appletree Medical Group
Building 1
Suite 20
1450 O'Connor Drive
East York ON  M4B 2T8
Tel: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-367-4301
Date Received: 27 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018