skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 22:36:05 PM

Tsang, Hoi Chau

CPSO#: 25488

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Dec 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Mar 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: National Defense Medical Center, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 1997
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Dec 1997

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Nov 1997
Summary:

In November 1997, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 29(3); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22); in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 29(27); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33). The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1) Dr. Tsang was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the Reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2) Dr. Tsang(s certificate of registration be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 09, 1996

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Mar 1992
Summary:

In March 1992, Dr. Tsang pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that his rights or privileges under the Narcotic Control Act (Canada) or the Food and Drugs Act (Canada) or the regulations under either of them had been restricted or withdrawn. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Tsang's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one month. The Committee also ruled that Dr. Tsang be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that he must cooperate with an inspection of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 27 Mar 1992

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jul 1981
Summary:

In July 1981, Dr. Tsang pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Tsang's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1982-01-27
Hearing Date(s): 17 Jul 1981