THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:03:16 AM
Chow, Peter Hong
CPSO#:
25453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter H. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Hong Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 4, 2017:
As of July 31, 2017, Dr. Chow has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.