THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:07:51 PM
Lee, Sai Kui
CPSO#:
25430
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jan 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Sai Kui Lee, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Sai Kui Lee:
(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of investigations under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigations”) by the College
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective 30 days from the date I execute this Undertaking (the "Effective Date").
(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(5) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(11) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public