THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:08:34 AM
Wong, Yuk-Shing
CPSO#:
25369
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Dec 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Nov-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Lingnan University, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
37 Dumfries Dr
Markham ON L6C 1R9
Tel: 905-887-5022
Date Received: 22 Nov 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:01 Jan 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2017 |