THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:09:03 PM
Mackenzie, Terence Anthony
CPSO#:
25273
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Aug 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2013 |