THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:46:19 PM
Peerbaye, Goolam Hossen
CPSO#:
25248
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Sep 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Yousouf Peerbaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to access medical records may call Margaret at (416) 759-8631 or Dr. Peerbaye at (416) 383-9588.
Date Received: 08 Jan 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2013 |