THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:33:07 PM
Mohamed, Mohamed Imamdeen
CPSO#:
25230
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above, c/o Dr. A. Giannopoulos.
101 - 855 Broadview Ave
Toronto, ON M4K 1Z1
Tel: 416-466-9908
Date Received: 09 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2018 |