THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:50:46 PM
Stewart, Peter David
CPSO#:
25213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Michigan, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Laurent Medical Centre
968 St Laurent Blvd.
Ottawa ON K1K 3B3
Phone: (613) 789-4385
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. David Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 23 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER DAVID STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |