THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:37:11 AM
Sherlock, Kevin Edward
CPSO#:
25194
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Aug 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1983 |