THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:50:56 AM
Riddle, Robert James
CPSO#:
25191
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Dec 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 16, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 19, 2013, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College that Dr. Robert J. Riddle's privileges were suspended, effective December 16, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1972 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Apr 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert James Riddle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 23, 2016:
Dr. Riddle was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his standard of practice and his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Riddle has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)