THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:25:34 AM
Hew, Ernest Milton
CPSO#:
25178
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
17 Rayneswood Crescent
Thornhill ON L3T 2N5
Phone: (647) 344-4933
Fax: (289) 472-5338
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERNEST MILTON HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2023 |