THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:48:06 AM
Macrae, Carey Gordon
CPSO#:
25113
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
07 Dec 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1972 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 07 Dec 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1994
Summary:
In November 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Macrae guilty of professional misconduct, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Macrae be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that his licence to practice be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-06-28
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 1993