skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/22 10:06:41 AM

Nicholson, Roger Gough

CPSO#: 25078

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Aug 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

File created prior to June 2006 are being stored by: 

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932 
Website: www.rsrs.com

For files created after June 2006, patients can write to:
 
1154 Westhaven Drive
Burlington, ON
L7P 5B3
Date Received: 29 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012