THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:08:29 AM
Mallam, Anthony Somerville
CPSO#:
25056
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1944
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1953 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 1959 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Armed Forces Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Armed Forces Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 1983 |