THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:27:33 PM
Chawla, Virendra Singh
CPSO#:
25038
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 May 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)