THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:32:45 PM
Loy, Frank Yee-Chuan
CPSO#:
25016
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2012 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 29, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Frank Yee-Chuan Loy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms please contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Loy:
2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated April 6, 2011 and October 21, 2011 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
3) Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
4) Hereby resign from the College effective February 29, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
11) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.