THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:26:39 AM
Arboleda-Florez, Julio Ernesto
CPSO#:
24979
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Patients seen at Belleville General Hospital please contact:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville, ON K8N 5A9
For patients seen at the Princess Street office in Kingston please write to:
Dr. J.E. Arboleda-Florez
483 River Ridge Drive
Glenburnie, ON K0H 1S0
Date Received: 02 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 1966 to 30 Jun 1967
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1967 to 30 Jun 1968
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1968 to 30 Jun 1969
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1969 to 30 Jun 1970
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
Resident 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jan 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |