THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:24:46 AM
Sawer, Benjamin Arthur
CPSO#:
24778
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:29 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Apr 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2008 |