THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:59:29 AM
Vanderburgh, George Albert
CPSO#:
24667
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2008 |