THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:13:18 PM
Bergen, Harry John
CPSO#:
24569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 58755
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Harry J. Bergen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARRY JOHN BERGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 May 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1986 |