THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:34:54 PM
Robertson, Duncan
CPSO#:
24426
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Durham, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |