skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 14:26:14 PM

Padmore, Lloyd Gregory

CPSO#: 24412

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lloyd Gregory Padmore to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2016:

Dr. Padmore’s practice is restricted to office-based obstetrics and gynaecology. He may not practise family medicine.

 

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 25, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (SCERP) Summary:

On August 25, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required gynecologist, Dr. Lloyd Padmore, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Padmore to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

• Attend and successfully complete the medical record-keeping course offered at the University of Toronto as well as a College-approved course regarding obstetrics, gynecology and infertility;

• Provide a written summary of each policy, guideline or tool with reference to how it is applicable to office gynecology, including:

o CPSO Medical Records policy #4-12
o SOGC guidelines (prenatal genetic screening, pelvic masses, risk of malignancy index and use of CA 125 in diagnosing ovarian cancer)
o Choosing Wisely materials regarding indications for ordering tests, relevant to the practice of Obstetrics and Gynecology
o CMPA modules in record-keeping
o CPSO Practice Guide

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.