THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:14:29 AM
Kanji, Amirali
CPSO#:
24394
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jan 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above.
c/o Dr. Sajad Zalzaia
1400 Provincial Road
Windsor ON N8W 5W1
ph: 226 216 8966
fax: 888.655.7536
Date Received: 15 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2013 |