THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:45:01 PM
Meyer, Dietmar Manfred
CPSO#:
24308
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Jul-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Manitoba, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |