THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:29:22 PM
Fettes, Ian William
CPSO#:
24307
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
16 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Nov 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ian Fettes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2015 |