THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:32:22 PM
Simard, Joseph Bruno Albert Renald
CPSO#:
24280
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Date Received: 22 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:18 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 29 May 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |