THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:30 AM
Chinner, Anthony Joseph
CPSO#:
24180
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English, Xhosa
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records pertaining to 1371 Neilson Road practice location can be accessed via:
Records Access Services Canada, Inc.
854 Upper Canada Drive
Sarnia ON N7W 1A4
Tel: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 102
Date Received: 20 Sep 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Feb 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anthony Joseph Chinner to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 22, 2017:
Dr. Chinner was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Chinner resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)