THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:41:15 PM
Wasan, Santosh Madanlal
CPSO#:
24132
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Bombay, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 807
225 Merton Street
Toronto ON M4S 3H1
Phone: (416) 481-8869
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:20 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANTOSH MADANLAL WASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1971 |