skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/07/20 20:40:41 PM

Butchey, Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi

CPSO#: 23968

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Butchey ( CPSO# 23968 )
Dr. J. Butchey ( CPSO# 50323 )

Business Address:
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Medical Records Location

Address: 68 Birchmont Walk London, ON N6K 4K5
Date Received: 20 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Maurice Rienzi Satyamurthi Butchey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 6, 2020:

Dr. Butchey previously entered into an undertaking with the College pursuant to which he agreed to undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. After the reassessment, Dr. Butchey resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Update: As of April 11, 2018, Dr. Butchey has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)