THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:06:05 AM
Rubenis, Andrew Arvids
CPSO#:
23909
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
27 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Latvian
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Arvids Rubenis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the following long term care/nursing homes:
Extendicare Rouge Valley: 551 Conlins Road, Scarborough ON M1B 5S1; Extendicare Scarborough: 3830 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough ON M1S 1R8; Leisureworld Altamont: 92 Island Road, West Hill ON M1C 2P5; Tony Stacey Centre for Veterans' Care: 59 Lawson Road, Scarborough ON M1C 2J1; Chartwell Guildwood: 65 Livingston Road, Scarborough ON M1E 1L1.
Date Received: 27 Mar 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2015 |