THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:11:40 AM
Cox, John Osborne
CPSO#:
23881
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. O. Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor, ON N9C 2L4
Date Received: 27 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |