skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/07/20 5:59:36 AM

Kronick, Stanley Harris

CPSO#: 23842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley Kronick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Apple Tree Clinic 225 Preston St Ottawa ON K1R 7R1 613-288-0279
Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their record should contact the address or phone number above.
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019