THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:43:38 PM
Kosinka, Eduard Gustav
CPSO#:
23768
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jan 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-Mar-2010
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, French, German
Education: Masaryk University of Brno, 1949
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1997 |