skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 12:09:55 PM

Kumar, Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna

CPSO#: 23759

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-(800)-775-0093 Fax: 1-(888)-316-4125 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Oct 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 10, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna Kumar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 10, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Kumar engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrical/gynaecological practice.

In the face of these allegations, Dr. Kumar resigned from the College on February 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or re- apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)