THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:42:12 PM
Haber, Gregory Bartholomew
CPSO#:
23667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
530 First Ave, HCC 4G
New York, NY 10016
New York NY 10016
United States
Phone: 646-501-2465
Fax: (646) 754-9598
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY BARTHOLOMEW HABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1971 |