THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:20 AM
Donald, David Melville
CPSO#:
23637
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:03 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1997 |