THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:07:07 AM
Naganobu, Edward Roland
CPSO#:
23244
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Oct 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E.R. Naganobu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton, ON L8P 4K3
Date Received: 23 Apr 2014
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. P.C. Chu
Dundurn Medical Group
160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton, Ontario
L8P 4K3
Tel: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 389-1104
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1972 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |