skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 21:39:47 PM

Flaherty, Thomas Hugh

CPSO#: 23133

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Sep 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients may contact Dr. Flaherty at 705-470-5461 to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 01 Dec 2014


Instructions/Address:

Patients may contact Dr. Flaherty at 705-585-1959 to request a copy of their medical records.
Date Received: 08 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009