THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:05:14 AM
Chan, Raymond Shiu Kwong
CPSO#:
23117
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jan 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 3, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective January 3, 2008, by Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
1. I, Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan, hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and any other body in any jurisdiction that regulates the practice of medicine and where I am a member, effective immediately.2. I hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.3. I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated May 17, 2007, for allegations respecting standard of practice for patient care. 5. I, Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan, by entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated May 17, 2007.